MA H220 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4307
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain businesses providing loans. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to negative equity
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4307 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4307 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4307 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H220 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H220.pdf |