MA H219 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a balanced sustainable development commission. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To establish the Western Massachusetts balanced sustainable development commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4406 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4406 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H219.pdf |