MA H2181 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the health of mothers and born alive fetuses after the second trimester. Public Health.
Title
Protecting the health of the mother and a born alive fetus after the second trimester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2023-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2887 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1783 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1785 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2277 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S1114 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H2887 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1783 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1785 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2277 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S1114 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2181 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2181.pdf |