MA H2177 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4933

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing a special commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4933
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1328 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H4933 (Replaced by) 2022-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback