MA H2146 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S477
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Accompanied S477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Accompanied S477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to compute and track the individual and collective lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions of all fuels. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing tracking and reporting requirements for Massachusetts transportation fuels and associated greenhouse gas emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Accompanied S477 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S477 (Replaced by) 2018-02-14 - Accompanied S479
H1724 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4749
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2585 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3564 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3994
S2302 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - See S2545
S2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2564
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
H1724 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4749
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2585 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3564 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3994
S2302 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - See S2545
S2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2564
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2146.pdf |