MA H4749 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4756

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 1724). July 12, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to energy efficiency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-12 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 402 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16SenateAccompanied H4756
2018-07-12SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-07-12HousePassed to be engrossed - 145 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 402)
2018-07-12HouseSubstituted for H1724

Same As/Similar To

H1724 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4749
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1881 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H4756 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Reported by H4857

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback