MA H2585 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an excise tax credit for the use of alternative fuels for heavy duty and medium duty vehicles. Revenue.
Title
Relative to encourage the use of alternative fuel heavy duty and medium duty vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-04-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1724 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4749
H2146 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Accompanied S477
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
H2146 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Accompanied S477
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2585 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2585.pdf |