MA H2087 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Keefe of Worcester, a petition of Mary S. Keefe and others that the Commissioner of Correction establish uniform standards regarding entrance of cell procedures, the use of chemical agents and restraint chairs, and the reporting and transparency of use of force. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To create uniform standards in use of force, increase transparency, and reduce harm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5117 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1362 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2087 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2087.pdf |