MA S1362 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2565
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create uniform standards in use of force, increase transparency, and reduce harm. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To create uniform standards in use of force, increase transparency, and reduce harm
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2565 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
H211 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
H211 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1362.pdf |