MA H206 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a diaper insufficiency fund. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a diaper benefits pilot program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H206 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H206.pdf |