MA H205 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Vieira of Falmouth, a petition of David T. Vieira and Timothy R. Whelan that the Board of Registration of Cosmetology promulgate regulations for aesthetics, barbering, cosmetology, electrolysis, hairdressing and manicuring mobile businesses and services. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
For aesthetics, barbering, cosmetology, electrolysis, hairdressing and manicuring mobile businesses and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H184 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H137 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1573 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1090 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1018 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1272 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1240 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H137 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1573 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1090 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1018 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1272 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1240 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H205 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H205.pdf |