MA S1018 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to electrical panels and workplace safety. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to electrical panels and workplace safety
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2379 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1761 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1755 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3264 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
H147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
H1761 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1755 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3264 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
H147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1018 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1018.pdf |