MA H2028 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clarifying the standards for requiring the installation of automatic sprinkler systems in rehabilitated buildings. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to fire protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2785 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2079 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1454 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1436 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3615 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2079 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1454 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1436 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3615 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2028.pdf |