MA H2079 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require a minimum of ten years of experience for firefighters to become chiefs of fire departments. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Pertaining to public fire safety and professionalism
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5117 |
2019-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1436 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1436 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2079 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2079.pdf |