MA H202 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emergency housing assistance for children and families experiencing homelessness. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Improving emergency housing assistance for children and families experiencing homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S111 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S135 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S85 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S135 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S85 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H202.pdf |