MA H1999 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of an independent contractor. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the definition of an independent contractor
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5023 |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S43 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S2610
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H1507 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1510 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H1507 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1510 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2270
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1999 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1999.pdf |