MA H1976 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4689
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to security risks at health care facilities. Public Health.
Title
Requiring health care facilities to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moran [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4689 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-12-11 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1930 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1656 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1416 (Similar To) 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4689
S1093 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1427 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2752
H4689 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1656 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1416 (Similar To) 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4689
S1093 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1427 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2752
H4689 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1976 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1976.pdf |