MA H1416 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 89-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing protections for health care employees who are victims of violence or assault and battery. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health care employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence

Sponsors

Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
2019-07-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-10HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1656 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H618 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S1093 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1427 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H1976 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback