MA H1926 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4782

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to end of life options. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to end of life options

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4782
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3350 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1208 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2745
H3438 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S697 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2449 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4782 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback