MA H1925 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to leaving the scene of a motor vehicle accident. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to leaving the scene of a motor vehicle crash
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H1488 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H1655 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S711 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2930
S719 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1484 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1596 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1498 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H1488 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H1655 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S711 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2930
S719 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1484 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1596 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1498 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1925 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1925.pdf |