MA H1498 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing criminal responsibility for motor vehicle operators who depart after knowingly colliding with or otherwise causing injury to any person on private property. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing criminal responsibility for motor vehicle “hit and runs” on private property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1498 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1498.pdf |