MA H327 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4242

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-14)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensure of appraisers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure of appraisers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4242
2021-07-07JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-07JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2021-07-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4242 (Replaced by) 2021-11-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback