MA H1488 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the filing for damages in small claims court against a public entity arising from potholes under the jurisdiction of said entity. The Judiciary.
Title
Permitting persons to bring car damage arising from a pothole against the public entity into small claims court
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S711 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2930
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1139 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S711 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2930
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1139 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1488.pdf |