MA H192 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the practice of sheet metal work. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sheet metal work

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseAccompanied H335
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H377 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H805 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Senate concurred
H2029 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2902 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H255 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H335 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H785 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H738 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback