MA H1895 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4685
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to maintaining confidentiality of proprietary information within health care oversight agencies. Public Health.
Title
Maintaining confidentiality of proprietary information within health care oversight agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4685 |
2016-07-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 30, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-09-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4685 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1895.pdf |