MA H1811 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of the town of Plymouth. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the charter of the town of Plymouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-03-09 | House | Enacted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-05-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H822 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S840 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H2333
H2949 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S840 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1502 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H2333
H2949 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1811 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1811.pdf |