MA H822 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5116
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting the diversion of water from the central water district of Plymouth County. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to water flow in the Central Plymouth County Water District
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5116 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1817 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
H5116 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
H5116 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H822 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H822.pdf |