MA H1778 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Markey of Dartmouth, a petition of Christopher M. Markey for an investigation by special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the legal and regulatory framework governing the bail system. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a bail reform and pretrial treatment task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2091 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H302 (Similar To) 2021-11-30 - Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2850 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H558 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1601 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2695 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S49 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback