MA H175 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment discrimination protections for legal cannabis. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to employment discrimination protections for legal cannabis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2056 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4699
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4699 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2056 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4699
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4699 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H175 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H175.pdf |