MA S75 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2661
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a minimum age requirement for entry into cannabis-related events, conferences, forums and exhibitions. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to establishing a minimum age of entry for cannabis-related events, conferences, forums and exhibitions
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2661 |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
H163 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H539 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4795
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1048 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S2661 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2526 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H539 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4795
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1048 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S2661 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2526 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S75 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S75.pdf |