MA H4699 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2056
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting employment discrimination based on the legal use of cannabis
Title
Prohibiting employment discrimination based on the legal use of cannabis
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development | Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-19 | House | New draft of H2056 |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2056 (Replaces) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4699
H175 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H175 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4699 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4699.pdf |