MA H1628 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the criteria for the release of terminally ill inmates to alternative locations of confinement. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to medical placement of terminal and incapacitated inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4625 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1332 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S843 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2415
S2304 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Reprinted as amended, see S2433
H1359 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1651 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1475 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
S1209 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H1332 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S843 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2415
S2304 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Reprinted as amended, see S2433
H1359 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1651 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1475 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
S1209 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1628 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1628.pdf |