MA H1475 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of solitary confinement in correctional facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
To reduce recidivism, curb unnecessary spending, and ensure appropriate use of segregation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4312 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4312 (Replaced by) 2016-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1255 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1332 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S843 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2415
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1209 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1213 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1255 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1332 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S843 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2415
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1209 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1213 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1475 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1475.pdf |