MA H1564 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to child custody arrangements of military personnel. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to child custody
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1564 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1564.pdf |