MA H1473 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to trespassing or loitering on school grounds. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the safety of school grounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3536 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3536 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1473 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1473.pdf |