MA H1457 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the forfeiture of parental rights for persons convicted of rape or abuse of their child. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the parental rights of survivors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1457.pdf |