MA H1443 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 11:00 am in 437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent and respond to bullying of elderly and disabled residents. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent and respond to bullying of elderly and disabled residents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
2019-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2019-03-21HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Housing
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback