MA S1072 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to address workplace bullying, mobbing and harassment, without regard to protected class status. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing workplace bullying, mobbing and harassment, without regard to protected class status

Sponsors

Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. James Welch [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Sen. Donald Humason [R]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21JointHearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1694 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1093 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1427 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S1096 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S984 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1656 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1057 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1416 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback