MA H1429 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Boylston be authorized to continue the employment of police chief Anthony Sahagian. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Boylston to continue the employment of police chief Anthony Sahagian
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Enacted |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-03-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
H1120 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4197 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2018
S2559 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
H1120 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4197 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2018
S2559 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1429 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1429.pdf |