MA H1120 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Boylston be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Boylston to convey a portion of a certain parcel of land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-12 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #136 [Yeas 37 to Nays 0] (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 266 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 266 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #136 [Yeas 37 to Nays 0] |
2017-10-04 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 266) |
2017-09-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2017-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2017 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018