MA H1433 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the position of director of public works in the town of West Boylston. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the position of director of public works in the town of West Boylston

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-18 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
2018-01-08SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-01-08HouseEnacted
2018-01-05SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-05SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-12-21SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-12-18HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended
2017-05-04HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-04-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-03-21JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1749 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1662 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3726 (Similar To) 2017-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2017
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2559 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback