MA H1409 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sex offenders. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to sex offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H627 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2253 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2550 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1019 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1295 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4063 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2253 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2550 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1019 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1295 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4063 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1409 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1409.pdf |