MA H4063 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5079
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the classification of assisted living residences. Elder Affairs.
Title
Clarifying the classification of assisted living residences
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5079 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2307 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H46 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5079 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H46 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2333 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5079 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4063 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4063.pdf |