MA S1526 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify certain probation officers and court officers in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to further defining employees classified in Group 4
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S157 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1006 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2160 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2071 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2079 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
S1006 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2160 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2071 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2079 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1526 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1526.pdf |