MA H1338 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4551
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to advanced placement examination for post-secondary level course credits. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to advanced placement examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4551 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1383 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
S655 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
H4551 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S655 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
H4551 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1338 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1338.pdf |