MA H1334 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5059
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Golden of Lowell, a petition of Thomas A. Golden, Jr., that the Department of Higher Education conduct a study evaluating the availability of online courses offered as part of a dual enrollment program hosted by certified institutions of higher education located in the Commonwealth. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to online education for high school students for college credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5059 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S351 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S854 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H5059 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S351 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S854 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H5059 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1334.pdf |