MA S351 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2749
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand high school student access to earn industry recognized credentials. Education.
Title
Expanding high school student access to earn industry recognized credentials
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] |
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2749 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S854 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1334 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5059
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S2749 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S854 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1334 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5059
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S2749 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S351.pdf |