MA H1245 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing Medicaid coverage for tobacco cessation programs and information. Health Care Financing.
Title
Providing Medicaid coverage for tobacco cessation programs and information
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Accompanied S792 |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2372 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2372
H2372 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2372
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1245 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1245.pdf |