MA S1475 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Medicaid coverage for doula services. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Medicaid coverage for doula services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-02HouseAccompanied H2372
2021-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2372 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1245 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S792
S792 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback