MA H1241 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to higher education capital investments in gateway municipalities or abutting municipalities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to higher education capital investment in gateway cities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H2479 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H481 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Senate concurred
H1208 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S762 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S304 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1724 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback